Frazier v. Kleine et al
Plaintiff: |
Alphonso V. Frazier, II |
Defendant: |
Arresting Officers, Don Kleine and Todd Schmaderer |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00077 |
Filed: |
March 10, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute this matter diligently and for failure to comply with this court's orders. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by June 19, 2017, that states a claim upon which relief may be granted against the defendants. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will resu lt in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: June 19, 2017Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $19.91 within 30 days,unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written mot ion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk&# 039;s office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 28, 2017: ini tial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whe ther summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed to institution) (KLF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?