Doe v. Omaha Public School District et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Susan Colvin, Wesley G. Dacus and Omaha Public School District
Case Number: 8:2017cv00096
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 52 Stipulation and dismissing the case with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that this case will not be consolidated with the Knutson action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the parties shall have until September 5, 2017 to show cause why Doe v. Shad Knutson, 8:17CV97 (D. Neb. 2017) and Doe v. Omaha Public School District, 8:17CV96 (D. Neb. 2017) should not be consolidated for purposes of case progression and discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Omaha Public School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley G. Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Richard P. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?