Canning Logistics Services, LLC v. Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Canning Logistics Services, LLC
Defendant: Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc., Paul Fowler and JT Reesor
Case Number: 8:2017cv00116
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Findings and Recommendation, ECF No. 60 , are adopted. Any other pending motions are terminated. The above-captioned action is dismissed, without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (LAC)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 54 filed by The Saathoff Law Group, PC, LLO, and its attorneys, Matthew P. Saathoff and Donald Loudner, III, is granted. Because Canning Logistics Services, LLC, cannot litigate in this forum without rep resentation by licensed counsel, on or before October 10, 2017, Canning Logistics Services, LLC, shall obtain the services of new counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf. If substitute counsel does not enter an appearance by O ctober 10, 2017, the Court may dismiss the instant action without further notice. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Canning Logistics Services, LLC, at: 13924 Gold Circle, Ste. 102, Omaha, Nebraska, 68144. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed as directed) (MBM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Canning's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Bond, ECF No. 37 , is denied. Defendants' Motion to Vacate Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 39 , is granted. The Preliminary Injunction, entered at ECF No. 34 , is vacated. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 15 , is granted in part as follows: a. Defendants are enjoined from attempting to collect on any debts allegedly owed by Plainti ff Canning Logistical Services, LLC, to Cyclone Carriers, LTD; b. Defendants are enjoined from contacting any customers of Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC, for the purpose of collecting any debts allegedly owed by Plaintiff Canning Lo gistical Services, LLC to Cyclone Carriers, LTD; 8 c. To the extent the Motion seeks the issuance of a preliminary injunction, it is otherwise denied; and 2. Within fourteen days of the date of this order, Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC will remit to the Clerk of the Court security in the amount of $350,000. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (E-mailed to Finance) (LAC)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. 15 , is granted in part as follows: a. Defendants are temporarily restrained from attempting to collect on any debts alleg edly owed by Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC, to Cyclone Carriers, LTD; b. Defendants are temporarily restrained from contacting any customers of Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC, for the purpose of collecting any debts allege dly owed by Plaintiff Canning Logistical Services, LLC to Cyclone Carriers, LTD; c. To the extent the Motion seeks the issuance of a temporary restraining order, it is otherwise denied. The portion of the Motion, ECF No. 15 , seeking the issuance of a preliminary injunction remains pending before the Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canning Logistics Services, LLC v. Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Nix
Represented By: Paul D. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fowler
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT Reesor
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canning Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Donald E. Loudner
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?