Mallory v. Douglas County Corrections Medical Staff et al
Plaintiff: Alan R. Mallory
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections Medical Staff and Heather Wetzl
Case Number: 8:2017cv00124
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this courts orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff must either file a new request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismiss al of this matter without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO 240, "Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit." The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: July 14, 2017: deadline for Plaintiff to file new IFP application or pay filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until June 29, 2017, to file an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: June 29, 2017: Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Alan R. Mallory shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.69 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/18/2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to appropriate official at plaintiff's institution)(CCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Douglas County Corrections Medical Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Wetzl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan R. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?