Ross et al v. Rynard et al
Plaintiff: Ron Ross
Defendant: Robert L. Rynard, Jr.
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Debtor: Skyline Manor, Inc.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 8:2017cv00132
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, ECF No. 13 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Robert V. Ginn is stricken as an attorney of record for Debtor. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2017/2018 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (SLP)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Robert V. Ginn is to pay the biennial assessment. Show Cause Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Findings and Recommendation of Chief United States Bankruptcy Judge Thomas L. Saladino, ECF No. 1 , are adopted. The statutory reference of bankruptcy under 28 U.S.C. § 157 is withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly assign a magistrate judge to this matter who will progress the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Rynard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Francis J. Lawall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Ross
Represented By: Nicholas A. Buda
Represented By: Brandon R. Tomjack
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Rynard, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn J. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Skyline Manor, Inc.
Represented By: Robert V. Ginn
Represented By: Patrick R. Turner
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?