Abdulkadir v. Frakes et al
Petitioner: Mohamed Abdulkadir
Respondent: Scott R. Frakes and Brad Hansen
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2017cv00142
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 25 ) is granted. The clerk's office is directed to provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO) Modified on 4/26/2018 to reflect copy mailed to pro se party (LKO).
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Request an Extension of Time (Filing No. 18 ) is granted. Petitioner shall file a response to Respondents' summary judgment motion no later than December 18, 2017. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following language: December 18, 2017: check for Petitioner's response. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Request an Extension of Time (Filing No. 16 ) is granted. Petitioner shall file a response to Respondents' summary judgment motion no later than November 8, 2017. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following language: November 8, 2017: check for Petitioner's response. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 4 and Supplement 9 filed by Mohamed Abdulkadir. Upon initial review of the amended and supplemental habeas corpus petitions (Filing Nos. 4 and 9 ), the court preliminarily de termines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. By August 28, 2017, Respondents must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. No later than 30 days after the relevant state court records are filed, Respondents must file an answer. No later than 30 days after Respondents' brief is filed, Petitioner must file and serve a brief in response. No later than 30 days after Petitioner's brief is filed, Respondents mus t file and serve a reply brief. *** Pro se case management deadline set for 8/28/2017: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. Pro se case management set for September 27, 2017: check for Respondents answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's request to proceed IFP (Filing No. 5 ) is denied. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee no later than June 12, 2017. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 12, 2017: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner shall no later than May 26, 2017, withdraw his pleading entitled "Notice of Intent to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus" or amend his pleading so that it sets forth all of his claims. Petitioner shall no later than May 26, 2017, submit the $5.00 filing fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis if he intends to pursue this matter. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 (&q uot;Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit") and the Form AO241 ("Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus"). The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case managem ent deadline in this matter with the following text: May 26, 2017: Check for (1) MIFP or payment and (2) motion to withdraw or amended habeas petition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with AO240 and AO241 forms) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulkadir v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed Abdulkadir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?