Vester, et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Joel Morales and Brian Vester
Defendant: Drivers Management, LLC and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00145
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all case progression deadlines are stayed pending the outcome of mediation; Once the parties schedule mediation, they shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge of the scheduled mediation date; and The parties shall advise the court of the outcome of mediation within three (3) days after it takes place. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
May 2, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to substitute counsel 41 is granted. Ian Maher, John K. Lilly, and Scott M. Lidman, attorneys with Littler, Mendelson, P.C. are granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Werner. The clerk of court shall remove their names from CM/ECF. Joseph E. Jones, Elizabeth A. Culhane and Brandon J. Crainer of Fraser Stryker, PC LLO, shall enter their appearance as counsel of record for Werner. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
April 24, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. AND DRIVERS MANAGEMENT, LLCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 14 ; PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND 23 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated an d attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts FinalRuling. The Court GRANTS the motion to transfer venue to the Nebraska federal district court 14 under the first-to-file rule. In light of this decision, Plaintiffs motion to remand 23 filed to this Court is MOOT. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 4/26/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vester, et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drivers Management, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Represented By: Scott M. Lidman
Represented By: John K. Lilly
Represented By: Ian Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Represented By: Scott M. Lidman
Represented By: John K. Lilly
Represented By: Ian Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Morales
Represented By: Yitzchak H. Lieberman
Represented By: Grace E. Parasmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Vester
Represented By: Yitzchak H. Lieberman
Represented By: Grace E. Parasmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?