G4S Technology LLC v. WCC Cable, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: G4S Technology, LLC
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and WCC Cable, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00182
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - All case progression deadlines, including the Rule 26(f) Report deadline, are stayed pending the outcome of mediation. On or before July 18, 2018, the parties shall notify the Court regarding the outcome of mediation. Member Cases: 8:17-cv-00483-LSC-MDN, 8:17-cv-00182-LSC-MDN Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss Count VI, ECF No. 74 , filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, is granted. Count VI of the Complaint, ECF No. 1, is dismissed, with prejudice. Member Cases: 8:17-cv-00483-LSC-MDN, 8:17-cv-00182-LSC-MDN Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Consolidation Order dated December 15, 2017, Filing No. 50 in WCC Cable, Inc. v. G4S Technology LLC et al., Case No. 8:17cv483, remains in effect. The two above-captioned cases are consolidated for all purposes. a. The Court de signates Case No. 8:17cv483 as the "Lead Case" and Case No. 8:17cv182 is designated as the "Member Case." b. The Court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properl y docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Case. The parties are instructed to file documents in the Lead Case and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question wheth er to spread the text. c. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. d. If a party believes a n item in addition to those described in paragraph b. should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in the Member Case. The motion must be filed in both the consolidated cases using the spre ad text feature. The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen G4S Technology, LLC, v. WCC Cable, Inc. et al., Case No. 8:17cv182. Member Cases: 8:17-cv-00483-LSC-MDN, 8:17-cv-00182-LSC-MDN Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to attorneys)(LAC)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 6 is granted in part, as follows: The above-captioned action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G4S Technology LLC v. WCC Cable, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G4S Technology, LLC
Represented By: Kory D. George
Represented By: Kerry L. Kester
Represented By: Todd W. Weidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Hartman
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCC Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Hartman
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?