Robertson v. Frakes
Petitioner: Keenon A. Robertson
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2017cv00201
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Petitioner may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without further authorization. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (filing no. 20 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. The clerk's office is directed to provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and 8th Circuit) (LKO)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. The court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as they are set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. By September 14, 2017, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: S eptember 14, 2017: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 16, 2017: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keenon A. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?