Robinson v. State of Nebraska
Plaintiff: Eric Robinson
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2017cv00204
Filed: June 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motions for reconsideration 45 and 46 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CCB)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for copies is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's "Motion to amend supporting information to existing complaint" (Filing No. 30 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions (Filing Nos. 21 , 24 ) are denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 14 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that no later than August 9, 2017, Plaintiff shall file a complaint with the $400.00 in filing fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall comply with Federal Rul e of Civil Procedure 8. Failure to comply with these requirements will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of the Memorandum and Order dated June 14, 2017 (Fili ng No. 4 ) with the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit") to Plaintiff at the current address on file for him. The clerk's office is directed to terminate the pro se case management deadline for July 21, 2017, and to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: August 9, 2017: check for complaint and payment of fees/IFP motion.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 21, 2017: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 14, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?