Taylor v. Tradesmen International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Bales Taylor
Defendant: Tradesmen International, LLC and Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00213
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - A telephonic conference is set for May 17, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. with the undersigned magistrate judge. Prior to the conference, the parties shall confer and be prepared to discuss any necessary additional steps for full and final resolution and the anticipated time frame for completing those steps. The clerk shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - The pending motion for leave to take deposition, (Filing No. 58 ), is granted. Plaintiff may depose Defendant's expert, Mr. James Gray, provided: a) the deposition is taken before April 15, 2018, and b) in advance of the deposition, Pla intiff pays the reasonable fee for Mr. Gray's time in preparing for the deposition and being deposed. Plaintiff's objection that Joseph E.W. Abler, Antelope County Attorney, was not adequately and timely disclosed as a witness as required u nder Rule 26 (a)(1)(A)(i), is denied. Mr. Abler's deposition may go forward as scheduled. The parties shall diligently work toward the goal of completing the depositions of the two toxicologists, the coroner, and Mr. Adler before April 2, 2018. If any circumstances arise which place the foregoing schedule at risk, and the parties cannot reach an agreement without court invention, they shall immediately contact my chambers for assistance. The parties are reminded that absent a written stipulation signed by counsel for both parties, the court will not enforce agreements to extend deposition deadlines. NECivR 29.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, ECF No. 40 is granted, in part, as follows: The Defendants are precluded from presenting into evidence, or making any reference to, the Report of Alcohol and Drug Analysis for Nebraska Traffic Crashes, dated December 29, 2015, regarding Decedent Thomas Bales, prepared pursuant to Neb. Rev. Stat. § 60-6,102, or any statements contained in that report; And the Motion is otherwise denied, without prejudice to reassertion of objections at trial. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER that the fact witness deposition deadline is extended to February 7, 2018. Except as to expert testimony which may be deemed irrelevant if Plaintiff's pending motion is limine (Filing No. 40 ) is granted, the expert witness deposition deadline is March 7, 2018. If Plaintiff's motion in limine, (Filing No. 40 ) is denied in whole or in part, depositions as to any expert testimony related to issues raised in that motion shall be completed on or before April 2, 201 8. Within ten (10) days after the ruling on Plaintiff's motion in limine, (Filing No. 40 ), the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers and schedule a hearing to discuss further case progression and the parties' interest in alternative dispute resolution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Stipulation Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The parties shall review the undersigned magistrate judge's practices posted at Civil Case Management Practices. Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before August 4, 2017, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report, a copy of which can be found at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms in Word and WordPerfect format. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Tradesmen International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bales Taylor
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: Tim J. Kielty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradesmen International, LLC
Represented By: John M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Enenbach
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?