McGrone v. Department of Corrections State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: |
Bruce McGrone |
Defendant: |
(Warden) State of Nebraska Diagnostic Evaluation Center (Facility), Department of Corrections State of Nebraska and Sorenson |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00222 |
Filed: |
June 26, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 30, 2018 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to reopen his case (filing no. 33 ) is denied. The clerk of the court send to Plaintiff a "Pro Se 14 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner)" form and application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed) (KLF)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 20 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
October 23, 2017 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's official capacity claims against Defendants are dismissed for the reasons set forth here and in this court's order dated August 11, 2017. (Filing No. 11 .) A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 20, 2017: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint - Pro Se, 1 filed by Bruce McGrone. Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against the Nebraska Department of Corrections and all other Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by September 11, 2017, that states upon which relief may be granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.58 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response t o a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the cou rt. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Augu st 11, 2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution) (KLF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?