Newell v. Continental Western Group
Plaintiff: Brian Newell
Defendant: Continental Western Group
Case Number: 8:2017cv00234
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, and the Court being fully advised, hereby GRANTS said Stipulation, and ORDERS that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to assume and pay his/its respective attorney fees and costs incurred. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - On or before April 16, 2018, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTION ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Continental Western Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Group
Represented By: Karen K. Bailey
Represented By: John R. Chase
Represented By: Sean P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Newell
Represented By: Gregory M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?