United States of America v. Mengedoht et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jan M. Mengedoht and Washington County Treasurer
Case Number: 8:2017cv00238
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - defendant's motion to stay, Filing No. 72 , is granted. This case is stayed pending a decision by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Vacate, Modify or Set Aside. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MLF)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 37 ) is granted. The United States is entitled to summary judgment against defendant Estate of Carl Mengedoht for unpaid federal estate tax liability in the amoun t of $2,790,403.66 as of October 1, 2018, plus interest and statutory additions according to law from October 1, 2018, until this judgment is paid. The United States is entitled to foreclose its valid tax liens against the Estate of Carl Mengedo ht in the amount of $2,790,403.66 as of October 1, 2018, plus interest and statutory additions according to law from October 1, 2018, which attach to and encumber Jan Mengedoht's interests in real property in Washington County, Nebraska, de scribed in this Memorandum and Order at 2-3, n. 2. The United States is entitled to collect the liabilities previously described by selling the subject property. The Court orders sale of the subject property under 28 U.S.C. § 2001. Proceeds from that sale shall be paid first to the United States for the costs associated with the sale and next to Washington County Treasurer for any unpaid real property taxes, remaining sales proceeds shall be distributed to the United States to satisfy the Court's judgment. After the federal tax lien has been satisfied, residual proceeds, if any, should be paid to the Trust, the property's present titleholder. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Mengedoht's objections/brief, Filing No. 16 , are overruled. Mengedoht's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 8 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that this matter is before the court on defendant Jan M. Mengedoht's second set of standing objections and refusal for cause, Filing No. 16. Pursuant to the court's order dated December 12, 2017, Filing No. 15, Jan M. Mengedoht was directed to file a brief in support of his motion to dismiss, Filing No. 8, within 14 days of the date of the order. He filed his standing objections, Filing No. 16, which the court construes as a brief. The United States shall file a responsive brief within 7 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The defendant's objections and refusal for cause, Filing No. 13 , are overruled. The findings and recommendation of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 11 , is adopted in its entirety. D efendants Estate of Charles A. Mengedoht and H C J Holdings Trust are in default, and the Court hereby enters default judgment against each of them. Jan Mengedoht shall file a brief in support of his motion to dismiss, Filing No. 8 , within 14 days of the date of this order, or face dismissal of his motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - On or before September 6, 2017, Defendants the Estate of Charles A. Mengedoht and H C J Holdings Trust shall obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf, in the absence of which the court may file an entry and/or judgment of default against each non-complying party without further notice. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Defendant Jan M. Mengedoht at 19855 County Road 11, Herman, NE 68029. Plaintiff's deadline for responding to Defendants' motion to dismiss is stayed pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mengedoht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan M. Mengedoht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin M. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?