Martin v. Frakes et al
Plaintiff: Carl A. Martin
Defendant: Adam Crop, Scott Frakes, Brian Gage, Chelsea Guffrie and Paul Tompkins
Case Number: 8:2017cv00253
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Concede (filing no. 36 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 33 ) is granted. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until January 26, 2018 to file a motion for default judgment against Defendant Chelsea Guiffre. Such motion shall fully comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55 and Nebraska Civil Rule 55.1. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 26, 2018: deadline for filing motion for default judgment against Defendant Chelsea Guiffre. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk's office shall obtain a current address for Defendant Tomkins from the Marshals Service. For service of process on Defendant Paul Tomkins in his individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Tomkins using the address provided by the Marshals Service and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service s hall serve Defendant Tomkins personally in his individual capacity at the address provided. Service may also be accomplished by using any of the following methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); NEB. REV. STAT. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). The United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to file under seal the service forms for Defendant Tomkins. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party; E-mailed to USM) (KLF)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Martin's claims against Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. Martin's Eighth Amendment claims may proceed to service of process against Scott Frakes, Adam C ropp, Brian Gage, Chelsea Guiffre, and Paul Tompkins in their individual capacities. For service of process on Defendant Scott Frakes in his individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Frakes using the address "Lincoln Regional Center, 801 West Prospector Place, Lincoln, NE 68522," and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marsh als Service shall serve Defendant Frakes personally in his individual capacity at the Lincoln Regional Center, 801 West Prospector Place, Lincoln, NE 68522. Service may also be accomplished by using any of the following methods: residence, certifie d mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendant Adam Cropp in his individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to compl ete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Cropp using the address "Tecumseh State Correctional Institution, 2725 N. HWY 50, Tecumseh, NE 68450," and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memoran dum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendant Cropp personally in his individual capacity at the Tecumseh State Correctional Institution, 2725 N. HWY 50, Tecumseh, NE 68450. Service may also be accomplished by u sing any of the following methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendant Brian Gage in his individu al capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Gage using the address at sealed Filing No. 28 in Case No. 4:17CV3047 and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendant Gage personally in his individual capacity at the address provided by the clerk of the court. Service may also be accomplished by using any of the follo wing methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendant Chelsea Guiffre in her individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Guiffre using the address at sealed Filing No. 30 in Case No. 4:17CV3047 and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memorand um and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendant Guiffre personally in her individual capacity at the address provided by the clerk of the court. Service may also be accomplished by using any of the following method s: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendant Paul Tompkins in his individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for Defendant Tompkins using the address "Lincoln Correctional Center, 3216 W Van Dorn St., Lincoln, NE 68522," and forward them together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendant Tompkins personally in his individual capacity at the Lincoln Correctional Center, 3216 W Van Dorn St., Lincoln, NE 68522. Service may also be a ccomplished by using any of the following methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). The United States Marshal shall serve all proce ss in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to file under seal any document containing the last-known personal addresses for Defendants Guiffre and Gage. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: December 26, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Carl A. Martin shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $38.65 by 8/25/2017, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion . The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/25/2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Crop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Guffrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?