Sharp Medical Solutions, LLC v. Stobbe et al

Plaintiff: Sharp Medical Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Loren Rock, Rock Medical Group, LLC and Denise Stobbe
Case Number: 8:2017cv00262
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. ( Exhibit Deadline set for 3/6/2018.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
August 15, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties' joint stipulation for extension of preliminary injunction (filing 37 ) is granted. The terms of the Court's July 21 Temporary Restraining Order (filing 24 ) remain effective for a period up to and including September 29, 2017. The hearing on preliminary injunction, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(3), is continued to September 28, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE. At that hearing, the Court will consider whether the terms of the Court's July 21 Order, as incorporated by this Order, shall be extended, modified, or dissolved. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
August 8, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 3, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Postpone Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Extend Temporary Restraining Order regarding Order on Motion for TRO 24 32 . The terms of the Court's 7/21/17 TRO remain effective for a period up to and including 8/15/17. The hearing on preliminary injunction is continued to 8/15/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
July 21, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is granted in part. This order is effective immediately and shall remain in full force for a period up to and including A ugust 4, 2017, unless extended pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2). A hearing on preliminary injunction, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(3), is set before Judge John M. Gerrard on August 4, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp Medical Solutions, LLC v. Stobbe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Rock
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Medical Group, LLC
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Stobbe
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Represented By: Kelsey M. Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharp Medical Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?