Edwards v. The Urban League of Nebraska, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Edwards
Defendant: The Urban League of Nebraska, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00266
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the parties' motions in limine (Filing Nos. 59 and 62 ) are granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendant's Previously Undisclosed Witnesses (Filing No. 46 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set out above. Plaintiff shall complete the depositions of the four witnesses by May 31, 2019. Non-expert witness must be disclosed, in accordance with the Court's amended progression order (Filing No. 18 ), by May 31, 2019. Trial exhibits must be disclosed, in accordance with the Court's amended progression order (Filing No . 18 ), by May 31, 2019. Motions in limine, other than those challenging the admissibility of expert testimony at trial, must be filed by June 6, 2019. The Final Pretrial Conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on June 18, 2019, in chambers, 111 Sou th 18th Plaza, Suite, 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. The proposed pretrial order must be emailed to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on June 13, 2019. Trial will commence, at the Court's call, during the week of July 15, 2019 before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 5/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. The Urban League of Nebraska, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Edwards
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Urban League of Nebraska, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?