Alvarado v. Hansen
Petitioner: Telesforo Alvarado
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2017cv00283
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Status Report on Request for Assembling of Record (filing no. 46 ) is granted to the extent consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 38 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 35 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 16 ) is granted. Petitioner's habeas petition (Filing Nos. 1 , 5 ) is dismissed with prejudice, and the court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Petitioner's "Request to Withdraw Ground Nine of Habeas Petition and Request to Stay [and] Abey Ground Nine of Habeas Petition" (Filing No. 23 ), "Motion for Leave to Submit Evidence Disputing Facts in Responden t's Opposition Brief to Motion to Withdraw Ground Nine of Habeas Petition" (Filing No. 27 ), and "Motion to Correct Statement Made and to Submit Evidence in Support of Argument Made in His Motion Disputing Respondent's Opposition Brief" (Filing No. 30 ) are denied as moot. The court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - that Petitioner's motion for status (filing no. 29 ) is granted to the extent consistent with this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that by December 4, 2017, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 4, 2017: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the following procedures must be followed by Re spondent and Petitioner. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the following procedures must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 2, 2018: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 6 ) is denied as moot. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismi ssal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 1, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO 240 form)(TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Telesforo Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?