Dunker et al v. Bachman
Plaintiff: Daniel H. Dunker and Richard W. Hill
Defendant: James E. Bachman
Trustee: Thomas D. Stalnaker and U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2017cv00284
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Bachman's motions for a new trial and to reopen the case (Filing Nos. 18 and 19 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The order of the bankruptcy court is affirmed. This action is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Appellees' motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute is denied without prejudice. Appellant's motion for extension of time to file a brief is granted. Appellant, James E. Bachman, shall file a brief in support of his position on or before September 29, 2017. Appellees shall file a brief in support of their position on or before October 16, 2017. Any reply brief shall be submitted byappellant/claimant on or before October 27, 2017. Appellees' objection to appellant's motion for extension of time is overruled. No further extensions of time to file briefs will be granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed to attorney James E. Bachman) (LAC)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Appellant, James E. Bachman, shall file a brief in support of his position on or before August 25, 2017. Appellees shall file a brief in support of their position on or before September 15, 2017. Any reply brief shall be submitted by appellant/claimant on or before September 22, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT from USBC-NE. Ordered by Chief Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (CS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunker et al v. Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel H. Dunker
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Hill
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas D. Stalnaker
Represented By: John D. Stalnaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?