Buc-ee's, Ltd. v. Bucks, Inc.

Plaintiff: Buc-ee's Ltd.
Defendant: BSD Bright Site Development LLC, Steven Buchanan, Bucks, Inc., Nathan Richardson and Tildon Sun Development, LLC
Interested Party: BSD Development, LLC, Buc-ee's Holdings, Inc. and Buc-ee's Management LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv00287
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2018 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 86 , filed by Defendants Buck's, Inc., and Steven Buchanan, is granted, in part, as follows: a. Counts IX, X, and XI of the Amended Complaint are dismissed, with prejudice; b. Counts I-VIII of the Amended Complaint are dismissed, with prejudice; c. Buc-ee's claim for breach of contract based on Buck's use of its BUCKY'S mark in Texas, as asserted in Count XII of the Amended Complaint, is dismissed, wit h prejudice; d. Buc-ees claim for breach of contract based on Buck's use of the word "Buc-ee's", as asserted in Count XII of the Amended Complaint, is dismissed with prejudice; The Motion is otherwise denied, without prejudic e; The Motion to Strike Expert Report, ECF No. 143 , filed by Defendants Buck's, Inc., and Steven Buchanan, is granted; and The Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 137 , filed by Plaintiff, Buc-ee's LTD, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
January 16, 2018 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pending motions. 1. The Motion to Change Venue or, Alternatively, to Stay, ECF No. 97 , filed by Plaintiff Buc-ee's Limited, is denied; 2. The Motion to Stay Case Progression, ECF No. 92 , filed by Defendants Buck's, Inc., and Steven Buchanan, is granted; 3. Discovery in this case is stayed until the Court has ruled on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 86 ; 4. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 86 , is ripe for decision; and 5. The Motion for a Pretrial Conference, ECF No. 125 , filed by Defendants, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
December 12, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
December 4, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff's tendered provisions as to paragraph 6 of the protective order shall not be included therein. Paragraph 18 shall be stricken from Defendants' proposed protective order unless both parties agree to its inclusion as currently written or as otherwise agreed upon. Defendants' proposed protective order, subject to paragraphs 1 and 2 above, is approved and shall be signed by counsel for each of the parties and submitted to the Court for approval on or before December 11, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
November 29, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY that the Stipulation and Joint Motion for Order Regarding E-Discovery (Filing No. 102 ) is granted, and the following Stipulated Order shall apply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buc-ee's, Ltd. v. Bucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSD Bright Site Development LLC
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Patrick C. Stephenson
Represented By: Charles D. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucks, Inc.
Represented By: Maggie L. Ebert
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Patrick C. Stephenson
Represented By: Charles D. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Richardson
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Patrick C. Stephenson
Represented By: Charles D. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tildon Sun Development, LLC
Represented By: Neal D. Cannon, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BSD Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Buc-ee's Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Buc-ee's Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buc-ee's Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph J. Berghammer
Represented By: Katherine L. Fink
Represented By: Matthew F. Heffron
Represented By: Janice V. Mitrius
Represented By: Jeffery F. Nadalo
Represented By: BUC-EE'S, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?