Burns v. First National Bank of Omaha et al

Plaintiff: Kevin E. Burns
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha and Wright S. Walling
Case Number: 8:2017cv00289
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Objection to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart's Order, ECF No. 32 , is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 7, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Objection to Magistrate Judge Cheryl Zwart's Order, ECF No. 26 , filed by Plaintiff Kevin Burns, is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
June 1, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, (Filing No. 24 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 6, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Disqualify. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
April 25, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before May 4, 2018, defense counsel shall mail a flash drive containing the telephone conversations between Plaintiff and Defendant that were previously emailed to Plaintiff. As to the remaining discovery issues raised by Plaintiff, any motion to compel by Plaintiff shall be filed on or before May 8, 2018. The parties shall comply with Nebraska Civil Rule 7.1 in filing, responding, and replying to this motion. Plaintiff, and Barbara R. Burns in her capacity as Plaintiff's repr esentative, shall not directly contact Defendant and its employees during the pendency of this lawsuit. Any communications by Plaintiff with Defendant shall be directed through Defendant's counsel of record. Defense counsel need not discuss Plai ntiff's case with Plaintiff's wife, Barbara R. Burns, as she is not Plaintiff's counsel for this litigation. If Plaintiff wishes to speak with defense counsel, he must email in advance to schedule an appointment to talk. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. First National Bank of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright S. Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?