Travelex Insurance Services, Inc. v. Barty

Plaintiff: Travelex Insurance Services, Inc.
Defendant: Lynn Barty
Case Number: 8:2017cv00295
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER - that the Plaintiff's Motion and Protective Order 15 should be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KMM)
May 9, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER - Plaintiff has requested that the Court slightly modify the language of its May 8, 2018 order (Filing No. 36 ). Plaintiff's request is unopposed. Accordingly, the May 8, 2018 order (Filing No. 36 ) is amended as follows: Plainti ff shall provide Defendant with a list of its customers with whom Defendant had contact and did business with while employed by Plaintiff. Following receipt of the customer list, Defendant shall identify the customers on the list whom she solicited a fter she left Plaintiffs employment, as well as those whom she conducted business with while employed at Arch. Defendant shall identify those customers within thirty (30) days of her receipt of the list from Plaintiff. Defendant shall respond to disc overy related to her activities prior to her employment with Arch, which includes business conducted via her personal email or telephone accounts. The parties shall confer and submit to the Court a revised, proposed protective order which includes an attorneys eyes only provision. The proposed protective order shall be submitted to the Court via email at bazis@ned.uscourts.gov by May 18, 2018. Arch shall produce its communications with Defendant up to May 31, 2017, aswell as Defendants empl oyment documents with Arch. Arch shall produce this information within seven (7) days of the entry of a modified protective order. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by July 31, 2018. All other caseprogression deadlines remain stayed. Follow ing rulings on summary judgment motions, the parties shall confer to discuss any remaining discovery issues, and then submit a proposed case progression schedule. The proposed case progression schedule shall be emailed to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov within seven (7) days of the Courts ruling on summary judgment motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
May 8, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - A telephone conference regarding a continuing discovery dispute was held on May 8, 2018. Following discussion, the Court's April 26, 2018 Order (Filing No. 31 ) is amended as follows: Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with a list of its customers with whom Defendant had contact and did business with while employed by Plaintiff. Following receipt of the customer list, Defendant shall identify the customers on the list whom she solicited after she left Plaintiffs employment. Defendan t shall identify those customers within thirty (30) days of her receipt of the list from Plaintiff. Defendant shall respond to discovery related to her activities prior to her employment with Arch, which includes business conducted via her personal e mail or telephone accounts. The parties shall confer and submit to the Court a revised, proposed protective order which includes an attorneys eyes only provision. The proposed protective order shall be submitted to the Court via email at bazis@n ed.uscourts.gov by May 18, 2018.Arch shall produce its communications with Defendant up to May 31, 2017, as well as Defendants employment documents with Arch. Arch shall produce this information within seven (7) days of the entry of a modified protec tive order. Counsel for Arch shall advise the Court no later than 5:00 p.m. on May 8, 2018 as to whether Arch wishes to withdraw its pending Motion to Intervene. (Filing No. 32 .) In the event counsel does not contact the Court by this deadline, the Motion to Intervene will be denied without prejudice to reassertion. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by July 31, 2018. All other case progression deadlines remain stayed. Following rulings on summary judgment motions, the parties shall c onfer to discuss any remaining discovery issues, and then submit a proposed case progression schedule. The proposed case progression schedule shall be emailed to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov within seven (7) days of the Courts ruling on summary judgment motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
April 26, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that Defendant shall provide the information outlined above within thirty (30) days of receipt of a customer list from Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
March 16, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - that the Plaintiff's Motion and Protective Order 15 should be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelex Insurance Services, Inc. v. Barty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Barty
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Represented By: Tara L. Tesmer Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelex Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Represented By: Ruth A. Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?