Chapman v. Retelsdorf, et al

Petitioner: Billie Joe Chapman
Respondent: Mark Foxhall, Klaus Hartmann, Sean Lynch and Judge Retelsdorf
Case Number: 8:2017cv00317
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting the defendant to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis as to Billie Joe Chapman. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
October 16, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
October 10, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's motions for reconsideration (filing nos. 35 and 36 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 29, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the petition for writ of habeas corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied without prejudice. All pending motions (including filing no. 18 , filing no. 19 , filing no. 20 , filing no. 21 , filing no. 24 and filing no. 25 ) are denied. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. Judgment will be entered by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
September 26, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 7 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 18, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's motion for immediate release (filing no. 15 ) is denied. Petitioner's motion for temporary restraining order (filing no. 16 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
August 29, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice . The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 28, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Retelsdorf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billie Joe Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Foxhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Klaus Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sean Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Judge Retelsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?