Reising v. Lewien
Petitioner: Gregory C. Reising
Respondent: Barb Lewien
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2017cv00321
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 16 ) is granted. Petitioner's habeas petition is dismissed with prejudice because it is barred by the limitations period set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d). The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (filing no. 25 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Copies (Filing No. 14 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 Motion for Copies. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: By December 4, 2017, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline i n this case using the following text: December 4, 2017: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 2, 2018: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner already paid the $5.00 filing fee with his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reising v. Lewien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barb Lewien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory C. Reising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?