Northern Natural Gas Company v. 80 Acres of Land in Thurston County, Nebraska et al

Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Defendant: 80 Acres of Land in Thurston County, Nebraska, Patricia E. Abatangelo, Christine Marie Solomon, Cora N. Solomon, Katherine Solomon, Michael Andrew Solomon, Nolan J. Solomon, Wilbur Solomon, Marianne Solomon Wiggans, United States of America and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 8:2017cv00328
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - Upon inquiry from the Clerk of the Court, IT IS ORDERED that funds payable to Katherine Solomon, whereabouts unknown, be sent to the address herein. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) Modified on 12/13/2018 to add copy to Finance.(JAB)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Solomon's motion to dismiss (filing 51 ) is denied. Solomon's motion to strike (filing 55 ) is denied. Northern's motion for summary judgment (filing 52 ) is granted. Upon deposit with the Clerk of the amou nts referenced below, Northern is entitled to a judgment establishing its right of way easement to wit. That the value of the New ROW on Allotment No 742-4 is $734.00 and the value of the New ROW on Allotment 742-2 is $2,984.00, and the sums shall be deposited with the Clerk forthwith. A separate judgment will be entered upon deposit of the above referenced amounts. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Northern's motion for partial summary judgment 35 is granted. Northern's condemnation action may proceed over Nolan Solomon's objection. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct document description (DCD)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - that the Clerk of the Court shall amend the docket entry for filing 32 to represent that the document is an answer to the plaintiff's amended complaint (filing 30 ). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion to file and Amended Complaint; granting 28 Motion to Stay discovery; and denying as moot 20 Motion to Strike Solomon's Answer and Counterclaim. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to effectuate alternative service, (Filing No. 12 ), is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to serve the Complaint for Condemnation on Cora M. Solomon by having the Thurston County Sheriff deliver a copy to Solomon's last known address, and by first class mail, postage prepaid, to Defendant Solomon at Solomon's last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality m ight reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This matter is before the court on its own motion. Accordingly, the plaintiff shall effectuate service and notice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 71.1. Upon effectuation of such notice, the plaintiff shall contact the chambers of the undersigned to set a hearing for a status conference at which all parties will discuss progression of the case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Natural Gas Company v. 80 Acres of Land in Thurston County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 80 Acres of Land in Thurston County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia E. Abatangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Marie Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cora N. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andrew Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan J. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Solomon Wiggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Comes
Represented By: Kristopher J. Covi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?