Wooley v. Medicine Horn Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Celeste Wooley
Defendant: Clear Trucking and Timothy A. Medicine Horn, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00342
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - All pending deadlines in this case are stayed. The parties shall file a joint report on or before April 30, 2018, and every thirty days thereafter, advising the Court on the status of the settlements approval. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
January 11, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's request for service by United States Marshal is granted. To obtain service of process on the defendants by the U.S. Marshal, Plaintiff must complete and return summonses forms and a USM-285 form for each defendant. Upon recei pt of the completed forms, the Clerk of Court will sign the forms, to be forwarded with a copy of the Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to March 16, 2018, to complete service of process. The show cause deadline is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
December 28, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that Plaintiff shall have until January 16, 2018, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
September 20, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the original complaint and accompanying pleadings without prepayment of costs or fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooley v. Medicine Horn Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Medicine Horn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Wooley
Represented By: Elaine A. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?