Mattox v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Alex Mattox
Defendant: C.C.S. Correction Care Solutions and Brad Johnson
Case Number: 8:2017cv00354
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 26, 2018: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by March 15, 2018, that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court d ismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: March 15, 2018: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $50.89 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those paym ents to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 14, 2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattox v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.S. Correction Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Mattox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?