Pitlor v. T.D. Ameritrade et al
Plaintiff: David Pitlor
Defendant: Kutak Rock LLP and T.D. Ameritrade
Case Number: 8:2017cv00359
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - that the plaintiff's motion to reconsider (filing 10 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall show cause why he should be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis, or he shall pay t he $400.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 3 ) is held in abeyance pending Plaintiff's showing of cause or payment of the filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until Plainti ff has made a sufficient showing that he is entitled to proceed in forma pauperis or the filing fee is paid. Failure to comply with this order will result in Plaintiff being dismissed from this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 30, 2017: deadline forPlaintiff to show cause or pay $400 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitlor v. T.D. Ameritrade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kutak Rock LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Ameritrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pitlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?