Jacobs v. Fareportal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ian V. Jacobs
Defendant: Fareportal, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00362
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER - that the motion to withdraw filed by Britton D. McClung, as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. 235 ), is granted. Britton D. McClung shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER - that the motions to withdraw filed by Scott J. Sholder and Lindsay R. Edelstein, as counsel of record for Defendant/Counter Claimant, (Filing Nos. 229 and 230 ), are granted. Scott J. Sholder and Lindsay R. Edelstein shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to compel issuance of subpoenas on Google LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., and Commission Junction, (Filing No. 151 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER - After conferring with counsel, (Filing No. 149 , audio file), as to Plaintiff's proposed third-party subpoena to be served on Corsearch, Inc., and Defendant's objections thereto,1) Document Request No. 3 is withdrawn with Pl aintiff's consent.2) Document Request No. 6 shall be modified to request "Documents and communications with third parties acting by or on behalf of Fareportal relating to the Cheapo Mark or cheapo.com."3) Any documents produ ced by Corsearch in response to the subpoena shall be provided to Defendant's counsel, and not directly to Plaintiff's counsel.4) With the foregoing modifications to the subpoena language, the subpoena may be served on Corsearch, Inc.5) Upon receipt of any documents from Corsearch, Inc. in response to Plaintiff's subpoena, defense counsel shall promptly review the documents and produce any unprivileged documents to Plaintiff's counsel. If any documents are withheld fr om production to Plaintiff's counsel by Defendant, defense counsel shall promptly contact the court and opposing counsel to discuss the procedure and schedule for resolving Defendant's privilege and/or work product objections.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, (Filing No. 119 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLA)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER - Plaintiff's anticipated motion to compel responses to Document Production Requests 73-75 shall be filed on or before September 28, 2018. Defendant's response shall be filed on or before October 5, 2018. No reply shall be filed absen t leave of the court for good cause shown. The parties are reminded that their briefs should not exceed 25 pages. They are further reminded that if the court must rule on a discovery motion even after convening a hearing to assist the parties in resolving their dispute, it is likely the court will not tailor the discovery requests to conform to the federal rules. Instead, it will rule on the objections to the discovery as drafted by Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Filing No. 2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulated Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Plaintiffs response to the pending motion to dismiss, (Filing No. 26), shall be filed on or before January 12, 2018Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - This matter is before the court on plaintiff's motion for limited expedited discovery, Filing No. 5 , prior to setting and ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction, Filing No. 2 . The court does not wish to rule on this moti on until such time as the defendant files a responsive pleading. Accordingly, once a response is filed, plaintiff's counsel is ordered to contact the court and convey the same. The court will then issue an order telling defendant to respond to Filing No. 5 . Thereafter, the court will enter an order regarding the limited expedited discovery. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Fareportal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fareportal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Eleanor M. Lackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian V. Jacobs
Represented By: Laura M. Fontaine
Represented By: Jacob B. Kring
Represented By: Britton D. McClung
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Carol A. Svolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?