Green v. Allied Oil & Tire Company
Plaintiff: Todd L. Green
Defendant: Allied Oil & Tire Company
Case Number: 8:2017cv00387
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 44 is granted. Parties have settled their various disputes. This action is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Stipulation for Protective Order. (Filing No. 13 .) For good cause shown, the motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Allied Oil & Tire Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Oil & Tire Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd L. Green
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?