Gardner v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: |
Justin Gardner |
Respondent: |
State of Nebraska |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00389 |
Filed: |
October 16, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2022 |
Filing
42
ORDER- Petitioner may not proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. This matter is closed, and Petitioner should refrain from filing any further frivolous appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
|
March 31, 2022 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's motion for relief in all of the above cases (Filing 55, Case No. 8:17CV255; Filing 35 , Case No. 8:17CV389; Filing 47, Case No. 8:17CV390; Filing 49, Case No. 8:18CV241; Filing 30, Case No. 8:18CV557) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
|
February 25, 2022 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner may not proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. This matter is closed, and Petitioner should refrain from filing any further frivolous appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
May 17, 2018 |
Filing
15
ORDER: The petitioner may not proceed informa pauperis on appeal. The Notice of Appeal to USCA 11 is out of time. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall not process the appeal. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall provide a copy of this order to the Clerk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing
10
ORDER - The motion to file a meritorious habeas petition (filing no. 8 ) and motion to extend (filing no. 9 ) are denied. The Clerk shall provide Petitioner with a copy of the standard habeas corpus petition. Petitioner is advised that he may file a new habeas corpus petition using the standard form that will be mailed to him by the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with AO241 form) (KLF)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER - that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
October 18, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER that Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further not ice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 17, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?