HCI Distribution, Inc. et al v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: HCI Distribution, Inc. and Rock River Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Tony Fulton and Douglas J. Peterson
Case Number: 8:2018cv00173
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order (Filing No. 59 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - The Parties' Stipulation (Filing No. 50 ) is approved and adopted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Unopposed Oral and Email Motion of the parties to amend Scheduling Order deadlines. (Filing No. 39 .) The Motion is granted. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The plaintiffs' equal protection claim is dismissed. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on its own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455(a), which states: Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned. Upo n review of the complaint in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455(a). The clerk shall refer the file to the Chief Judge for reassignment to a different magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HCI Distribution, Inc. et al v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Fulton
Represented By: Daniel J. Muelleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Peterson
Represented By: Daniel J. Muelleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCI Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock River Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?