Denenberg v. ECO Health Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Steven Denenberg
Defendant: EHL Inc., Michael E. Kovacs and ECO Health Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00279
Filed: June 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Attorney Daniel J. Epstein on behalf of Defendants ECO Health Inc., EHL Inc., Michael E. Kovacs.(Epstein, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel J. Epstein on behalf of Defendants ECO Health Inc., EHL Inc., Michael E. Kovacs (Epstein, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jeana L. Goosmann on behalf of Defendants ECO Health Inc., EHL Inc., Michael E. Kovacs (Goosmann, Jeana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Defendants ECO Health Inc., EHL Inc., Michael E. Kovacs (Carney, Joel)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that on or before July 13, 2018, the attorney(s) listed above shall either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this Order will result in Mr. Denenberg being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 20, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement filed on 6/20/18. (Original form mailed to the Office of Register/Commissioner with a copy of Complaint #1 .) (LKO)
June 20, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Norman Denenberg has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 8:18cv279 against ECO Health Inc, EHL, Inc, Michael Kovacs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3706108), by Attorney Norman Denenberg on behalf of Steven M. Denenberg(Denenberg, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denenberg v. ECO Health Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHL Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Kovacs
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECO Health Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Denenberg
Represented By: Norman Denenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?