Blackstock v. Frakes et al
Petitioner: |
Jesse Blackstock |
Respondent: |
Case Manager Coleman, Scott Frakes, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Sargent Riesdorff and Unit Manager Conroy |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2018cv00280 |
Filed: |
June 20, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court certifies that his appeal is frivolous and not taken in good faith, and Petitioner may not proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The court will not act on Petitioners notice of appeal. (Filing No. 7 .) The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Petitioner's notice of appeal and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The habeas corpus petition (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice and particularly without prejudice to reassertion in an action brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The Clerk shall mail a copy of Pro Se 14 (Rev. 12/16) Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) and a copy of AO 240 (Rev. 07/10) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) to Mr. Blackstock. Judgment will be entered by separate order. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
|
June 21, 2018 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 23, 2018: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?