Harrington et al v. Strong et al
Plaintiff: Meltech, Inc., Shane Harrington, Midwest Girls Club and H & S Club Omaha, Inc.
Defendant: Pete Ricketts, John and Jane Doe Nebraska State Patrol Officers #1-#800, Colene Hinchy, Patty Brooks, Michelle Bang, John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1-#900, Robert Batt, Jean Stothert, Theresa Thibodeau, Ken Kanger, Todd Schmaderer, Doug Peterson, Hobert Rupe, Chris Jerram, Aimee Melton, John Bolduc, John Doe Building Inspectors #1 and #2, Brenda Konfrst, Paul Kratz, The City of Omaha Nebraska, Susan Strong, William Acosta-Trejo, Fender, John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #9, Carol Blood, Patty Pansing Brooks, John and Jane Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #900 and John Doe Omaha Building Inspectors #1 and #2
Case Number: 8:2018cv00383
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Shane Harrington(Spencer, Evan)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (Filing No. #31 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
September 11, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Bolduc on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Brenda Konfrst on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Patty Brooks on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Batt on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Pete Ricketts on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Hobert Rupe on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Susan Strong on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Theresa Thibodeau on 9/10/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Doug Peterson, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Susan Strong, Theresa Thibodeau. In consideration of Plaintiffs' requested extensions #37 and the State Defendants' response #41 , Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time to October 9, 2018, to file an amended complaint. Thereafter, all defendants may have 21-days to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to defendant's Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Susan Strong and Theresa Thibodeau in their official capacities. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
September 9, 2018 Filing 42 Summons Requested as to State Defendants In Their Official Capacities regarding Complaint #1 . (Spencer, Evan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE regarding Response #37 by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Doug Peterson, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Susan Strong, Theresa Thibodeau.(Post, Ryan)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER regarding the Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #36 . On or before September 7, 2018, Defendants Doug Peterson, Theresa Thibodeau, Susan Strong, Pete Ricketts, Patty Brooks, Hobert Rupe, Robert Batt, John Bolduc, and Brenda Konfrst shall file a response to Plaintiffs' requested extensions of time set forth in their Partial Opposition to State Defendants' Motion for Extension #37 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 39 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #38 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants Michelle Bang, Colene Hinchy, Chris Jerram, John Doe Building Inspectors #1 and #2, John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #10, Ken Kanger, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, The City of Omaha Nebraska.(Peters, Michelle)
September 4, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants Michelle Bang, Colene Hinchy, Chris Jerram, Ken Kanger, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, The City of Omaha Nebraska.(Peters, Michelle)
September 3, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE regarding MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #36 Partial Opposition by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Harrington.(Spencer, Evan)
September 2, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Doug Peterson, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Susan Strong, Theresa Thibodeau.(Post, Ryan)
September 1, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery #31 by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Harrington.(Spencer, Evan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 34 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery #31 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants Michelle Bang, Colene Hinchy, Chris Jerram, John Doe Building Inspectors #1 and #2, John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #10, Ken Kanger, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, The City of Omaha Nebraska.(Peters, Michelle)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Declaratory Judgment, ECF No. #5 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Harrington, H&S Club Omaha, Inc., Meltech, Inc., and Midwest Girls Club, is denied, in part, as follows: Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order is denied. An evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive and declaratory relief may be scheduled by contacting the courtroom deputy. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KMG)
August 22, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Brenda Konfrst, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Susan Strong (Post, Ryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Spencer, Evan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Declaratory Judgment #5 by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Harrington.(Spencer, Evan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 29 EXHIBIT LIST from Motion hearing held on 08/20/2018. (LAC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Smith Camp regarding on Motion for Temporary Retraining Order #5 . Motion Hearing held on 08/20/2018. Evidence by the Plaintiff and Defendant. Matter taken under advisement. Order to be issued. Hearing held in Omaha, NE;Courtroom Deputy: Laura Coyle; Court Reporter: Brenda L. Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiffs: Evan Spencer; Appearance for Defendant: Michelle A. Peters, Benjamin M. Goins, and Ryan A. Post; Time Start: 2:42 p.m.; Time Stop: 3:49 p.m.;Time in Courts: 1 hour 7 minutes.(LAC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 27 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Declaratory Judgment #5 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants Michelle Bang, Colene Hinchy, Chris Jerram, John Doe Building Inspectors #1 and #2, John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #10, John and Jane Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #900, Ken Kanger, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, The City of Omaha Nebraska.(Peters, Michelle)
August 16, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Brenda Konfrst on 8/16/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Bolduc on 8/16/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Theresa Thibodeau on 8/16/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Batt on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Hobert Rupe on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Benjamin M. Goins on behalf of Defendants Doug Peterson, Theresa Thibodeau (Goins, Benjamin)
August 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Doug Peterson, Theresa Thibodeau (Post, Ryan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Plaintiffs are ordered to make best efforts to notify Defendants of the hearing and this order, and will report to the Court at the hearing on their efforts to notify. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
August 14, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Pete Ricketts on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Patty Brooks on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Doug Peterson on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Susan Strong on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul Kratz on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Aimee Melton on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Chris Jerram on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant The City of Omaha Nebraska on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jean Stothert on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michelle Bang on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Colene Hinchy on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ken Kanger on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Todd Schmaderer on 8/14/2018. (Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and Declaratory Judgment by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion)(Spencer, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants Michelle Bang, Robert Batt, John Bolduc, Patty Brooks, Colene Hinchy, Chris Jerram, Ken Kanger, Brenda Konfrst, Paul Kratz, Aimee Melton, Doug Peterson, Pete Ricketts, Hobert Rupe, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, Susan Strong, The City of Omaha Nebraska and Theresa Thibodeau. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Spencer, Evan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand and Civil Cover Sheet against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3741640), by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Shane Harrington (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spencer, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington et al v. Strong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Ricketts
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Nebraska State Patrol Officers #1-#800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colene Hinchy
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Bang
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1-#900
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Batt
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stothert
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Thibodeau
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Kanger
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schmaderer
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Peterson
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobert Rupe
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jerram
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Melton
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bolduc
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Building Inspectors #1 and #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Konfrst
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kratz
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Omaha Nebraska
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Strong
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Acosta-Trejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #9
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Pansing Brooks
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Benjamin M. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Omaha Police Officers #1 - #900
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Omaha Building Inspectors #1 and #2
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meltech, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Harrington
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Girls Club
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H & S Club Omaha, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?