Sadowski v. The Huse Publishing Company

Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: The Huse Publishing Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv00400
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David E. Copple on behalf of Defendant The Huse Publishing Company.(Copple, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Huse Publishing Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (ADB)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Unopposed). Defendant shall have an extension of time to November 13, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David E. Copple on behalf of Defendant The Huse Publishing Company.(Copple, David)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Unopposed). Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 12, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David E. Copple on behalf of Defendant The Huse Publishing Company.(Copple, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant The Huse Publishing Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing filed on 8/21/2018 of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 ). (LKO)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to The Huse Publishing Company regarding Complaint, #1 . (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against The Huse Publishing Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3747302), by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Christopher Sadowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. The Huse Publishing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huse Publishing Company
Represented By: David E. Copple
Represented By: Spencer W. Werth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?