Harmel v. Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kayleen M. Harmel
Defendant: Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00401
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Andrew J. Hilger on behalf of Defendant Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc..(Hilger, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CCB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Andrew J. Hilger on behalf of Defendant Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc. (Hilger, Andrew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc.. Waiver sent on 9/6/2018. (Hilger, Andrew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3747915), by Attorney Alexis S. Mullaney on behalf of Kayleen M. Harmel(Mullaney, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmel v. Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayleen M. Harmel
Represented By: Alexis S. Mullaney
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Hughes Tree Service, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Hilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?