Ruser v. Liggett Vector Brands L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Patricia Ruser
Defendant: Liggett Vector Brands LLC and Liggett Vector Brands LL.C.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00403
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Service by Attorney Brock J. Pohlmeier on behalf of Defendant Liggett Vector Brands LL.C..(Pohlmeier, Brock)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 12/7/18 addressing mediation requirements. Planning Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Ruser.(Brandon, Kelly)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint regarding: Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #5 by Liggett Vector Brands LL.C. (Hoyme, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Liggett Vector Brands LL.C. (Hoyme, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent VGR Holding LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Vector Group Ltd., a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate Vector Group Ltd., a Delaware corporation for Liggett Vector Brands LL.C.. by Attorney Christopher E. Hoyme on behalf of Defendants Liggett Vector Brands LL.C., VGR Holding LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Vector Group Ltd., a Delaware corporation, Vector Group Ltd., a Delaware corporation.(Hoyme, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Liggett Vector Brands LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of and Petition for Removal against Patricia Ruser from In the District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-2131 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3749006) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Christopher E. Hoyme on behalf of Liggett Vector Brands LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoyme, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruser v. Liggett Vector Brands L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liggett Vector Brands LLC
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liggett Vector Brands LL.C.
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ruser
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Represented By: Stephanie J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?