Perina v. BH Media Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: George Perina
Defendant: BH Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00404
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of Judgment #7 .) (KLF)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT - On the plaintiff's notice of dismissal with prejudice (filing #6 ), the plaintiff's claims against the defendant are dismissed with prejudice.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Plaintiff George Perina (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 9/7/2018 to change event to Notice of Case Dismissal (CS).
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register/Commissioner with a copy of complaint #1 .) (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant BH Media Group, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (CS)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to BH Media Group, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BH Media Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3749838), by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of George Perina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perina v. BH Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Perina
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?