International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 et al v. Mustang Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund, IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A, Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22, Nebraska Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Labor Management Cooperation Committee, National Electrical Contractors Association, IBEW Local 22/NECA Health and Welfare Plan and IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B
Defendant: Mustang Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00439
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Mustang Electric, Inc. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant) (LKO)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Mustang Electric, Inc. by Attorney Frederick Zarate on behalf of Plaintiffs IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B, IBEW Local 22/NECA Health and Welfare Plan, IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22, Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee, National Electrical Benefit Fund, National Electrical Contractors Association, National Labor Management Cooperation Committee, Nebraska Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund.(Zarate, Frederick)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon the Registered Agent for defendant Mustang Electric, Inc. on 9/20/2018. (Zarate, Frederick)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Mustang Electric, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Mustang Electric, Inc. regarding Complaint,, #1 . (Zarate, Frederick)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mustang Electric, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3767674), by Attorney Frederick Zarate on behalf of Nebraska Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A, National Electrical Benefit Fund, IBEW Local 22/NECA Health and Welfare Plan, National Electrical Contractors Association, IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22, National Labor Management Cooperation Committee, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zarate, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 et al v. Mustang Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Labor Management Cooperation Committee
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Contractors Association
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustang Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?