United States of America v. Widtfeldt

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James Widtfeldt
Case Number: 8:2018cv00453
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court on receipt of an "Answer and Counterclaim that the US Democrat Party is Unlawful and Dissolved and is the Source of Wrongful Kelly-Shoemaker Complaint" with attached "Notice of Appeal and Appeal Fee of $505" which is a duplicate of Filing No. #8 , along with a check for $505 received from Defendant James Widtfeldt ("Widtfeldt"). For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order of October 29, 2018 (Filing No. #9 ), Widtfeldt's duplicate document and accompanying $505 appeal fee should be returned to Witdfeldt. The Clerk's Office is directed to return James Widtfeldt's duplicate document and check, number 4817, dated October 26, 2018, to him at his last known address. (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender) Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant James Widtfeldt's "Notice of Appeal and Appeal Fee of $505" shall be construed as part of his "Answer and Counterclaim that the US Democrat Party isUnlawful and Dissolved and is the Source of Wrongful Kelly-ShoemakerComplaint." Filing No. #8 . The Clerk's Office is directed to return James Widtfeldt's check, number 4818, dated October 26, 2018, to him at his last known address. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party with original check #4818)(ADB)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by James Widtfeldt. (ADB)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant James Widtfeldt. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to James Widtfeldt regarding Complaint #1 . (Shoemaker, Martin)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - This case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter for disposition and remains with Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the Order of Recusal, ECF No. #3 , this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - that I recuse myself from this case and that the Clerk shall refer this matter to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Widtfeldt, by Attorney Martin M. Shoemaker on behalf of United States of America(Shoemaker, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Widtfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Widtfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin M. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?