Chandler v. Cabela's, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Chandler
Defendant: Cabela's Inc., Cabela's LLC and Cabela's, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00454
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Service by Attorney Brock J. Pohlmeier on behalf of Defendant Cabela's Inc..(Pohlmeier, Brock)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 11:00 a.m. on February 11, 2019. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by January 7, 2019 addressing mediation requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendants Cabela's Inc., Cabela's, LLC.(Wentz, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendants Cabela's, LLC, Cabela's Inc..(Wentz, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING LETTER - CONSENT - The court expects the parties to file the completed Form 35 ("Rule 26(f) Report"), including the parties' preferences as to consent, on or before November 5, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cabela's Inc., Cabela's, LLC (Wentz, Kenneth)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cabela's LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cabela's Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of and Petition for Removal against Mary Chandler from In the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-2832 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3772371) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Cabela's LLC, Cabela's Inc.(Wentz, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Cabela's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Chandler
Represented By: Abby K. Osborn
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabela's Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabela's LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabela's, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?