United States of America v. Martens et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ARL Credit Services, Inc., Lillian Marie Martens, Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Midland Funding LLC and Wakefield and Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00494
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: John M Gerrard
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to defendant Capital One Bank (USA) NA. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Capital One Bank regarding Amended Complaint, #6 . (Homan, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants Lillian Marie Martens, Midland Funding LLC, and Wakefield and Associates, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Midland Funding regarding Amended Complaint, #6 . (Homan, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Wakefield & Associates regarding Amended Complaint, #6 . (Homan, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Lillian Marie Martens regarding Amended Complaint, #6 . (Homan, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant ARL Credit Services, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/12/2018. (Homan, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant ARL Credit Services, Inc., Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Lillian Marie Martens, Midland Funding LLC, Wakefield and Associates, Inc., by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of United States of America(Homan, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint [4-1] on or before November 14, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Homan, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant ARL Credit Services, Inc.. Waiver sent on 10/22/2018. (Homan, Robert)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARL Credit Services, Inc., Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Lillian Marie Martens, Midland Funding LLC, by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage for Nebraska, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Reamortization Agreement)(Homan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Martens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARL Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Marie Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?