Crabar/GBF, Inc. v. Wright Printing Co. et al

Plaintiff: Crabar/GBF, Inc.
Defendant: Wright Printing Co., Mark Wright, Jamie Fredrickson, Alexandra Kohlhaas and Mardra Sikora
Case Number: 8:2018cv00520
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: John M Gerrard
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson with counsel for the parties on December 20, 2018. Discussion held regarding several matters, including pending issues in the related case, Crabar/GBF, Inc. v. Wright et al, 8:16cv537, and the progression of both this case and the related case. Order to be issued in the related case in accordance with the discussion held with counsel. (SMN)
December 17, 2018 Filing 32 Certificate regarding MOTION to Consolidate Case(s) 8:16cv537, 8:18cv520 #30 , Brief #31 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(Cooper, Patrick)
December 17, 2018 Filing 31 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Consolidate Case(s) 8:16cv537, 8:18cv520 #30 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(Cooper, Patrick)
December 17, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Consolidate Case(s) 8:16cv537, 8:18cv520 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(Cooper, Patrick)
December 13, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Jamie Fredrickson defendant Jamie Fredrickson on 12/10/2018. (Shotkoski, Paul)
December 13, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Wright on 12/10/2018. (Shotkoski, Paul) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct defendant's name (KLF).
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney James D. Johnson on behalf of Defendant Wright Printing Co..(Johnson, James)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting 24 Email Motion. A Status Conference is set for December 20, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #20 by Attorney James D. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Jamie Fredrickson, Alexandra Kohlhaas, Mardra Sikora, Mark Wright, Wright Printing Co..(Johnson, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 24 TEXT EMAIL MOTION - by counsel for Plaintiff requesting a telephonic status conference with Magistrate Judge Nelson. (SMN)
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Alexandra Kohlhaas on 11/21/2018. (Cooper, Patrick)
November 29, 2018 Filing 22 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #20 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(Cooper, Patrick)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Wright Printing Co.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James D. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Jamie Fredrickson, Alexandra Kohlhaas, Mardra Sikora, Mark Wright, Wright Printing Co..(Johnson, James)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wright Printing Co. on 11/6/2018. (Cooper, Patrick)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mardra Sikora on 11/3/2018. (Cooper, Patrick)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney Stephen O'Donnell. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3796454 by Attorney Stephen O'Donnell on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(O'Donnell, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Elissa L. Isaacs. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3795485 by Attorney Elissa L. Isaacs on behalf of Plaintiff Crabar/GBF, Inc..(Isaacs, Elissa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to defendants Jamie Fredrickson, Alexandra Kohlhaas, Mardra Sikora, Mark Wright, and Wright Printing Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Mark Wright regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Wright Printing Company regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Mardra Sikora regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Alexandra Kohlhaas regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Jamie Fredrickson regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Ennis, Inc. for Crabar/GBF, Inc.. by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiffs Crabar/GBF, Inc., Ennis, Inc..(Cooper, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark number 2247736. Complaint Filed on 10/31/18. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Stephen O'Donnell has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Elissa L. Isaacs has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LKO)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3794991), by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Crabar/GBF, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Cooper, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabar/GBF, Inc. v. Wright Printing Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Printing Co.
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wright
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Fredrickson
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Kohlhaas
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardra Sikora
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crabar/GBF, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Stephen O'Donnell
Represented By: Sarah L. McGill
Represented By: Elissa L. Isaacs
Represented By: Paul M. Shotkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?