Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. El Vallarta, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: El Vallarta, LLC, El Vallarta IV, LLC and El Vallarta III, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jennifer Villafuerte
Case Number: 8:2018cv00522
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Intervenor COMPLAINT against El Vallarta III, LLC, El Vallarta IV, LLC, El Vallarta, LLC, by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Jennifer Villafuerte(Brandon, Kelly)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. This action is stayed and all deadlines in this case are extended by the same duration as the government shutdown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Intervene. Plaintiff/Intervenor's Complaint in Intervention shall be filed by January 2, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Meredith S. Berwick on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Berwick, Meredith)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene #7 by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Jennifer Villafuerte.(Brandon, Kelly)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Jennifer Villafuerte.(Brandon, Kelly)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant El Vallarta IV, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/6/2018. (Eichmann, Justin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant El Vallarta III, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/6/2018. (Eichmann, Justin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant El Vallarta, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/6/2018. (Eichmann, Justin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Defendants El Vallarta III, LLC, El Vallarta IV, LLC, El Vallarta, LLC (Eichmann, Justin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against El Vallarta III, LLC, El Vallarta IV, LLC, El Vallarta, LLC, by Attorney Meredith S. Berwick on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Berwick, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. El Vallarta, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Vallarta, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Vallarta IV, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Vallarta III, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Meredith S. Berwick
Represented By: Emily Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jennifer Villafuerte
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?