Endicott v. INS "Perez" et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Endicott
Defendant: U.S. Customs Immigration Services, INS "Perez" and F. Gerard Heinauer
Case Number: 8:2018cv00554
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER with clerk's response on behalf of Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. (TCL)
December 31, 2018 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Michael James Endicott on 12/31/2018. Receipt number 8050107, in the amount of $72.33. (KLF)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Michael Endicott shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.47 by January 14, 2019, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed)(ADB)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (TCL)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Complaint - Pro Se #1 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1. (mailed to pro se party with a copy of the complaint)(ADB) Deficiency satisfied on 12/12/2018 (ADB).
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. (ADB)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CS)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (copy mailed to Inmate Accounting and to pro se party) (ADB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. (ADB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Michael James Endicott. (ADB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against F. Gerard Heinauer, INS "Perez", U.S. Customs Immigration Services, no Summons(es) issued, filed on behalf ofMichael James Endicott.(ADB) (Modified on 12/12/18 to add document with signature: #1 Signed Complaint) (ADB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endicott v. INS "Perez" et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INS "Perez"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gerard Heinauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Endicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?