Garza v. Packaging Corporation of America
Plaintiff: Dominick Garza
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Case Number: 8:2018cv00564
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America.(Millsap, Sarah)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Packaging Corporation of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Caitlin Ellis on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America (Ellis, Caitlin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand Affirmative Defenses by Packaging Corporation of America (Millsap, Sarah)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to January 25, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America.(Millsap, Sarah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America (Millsap, Sarah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Packaging Corporation of America on 12/14/2018. (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Packaging Corporation of America. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Packaging Corporation of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3815958), by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Dominick Garza(Turco Meyer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Packaging Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Garza
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Represented By: Caitlin Ellis
Represented By: Sarah J. Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?