Eureka Database Solutions, LLC v. Agile Sports Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eureka Database Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Agile Sports Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00587
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: John M Gerrard
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to February 15, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc. on 12/26/2018. (Eichmann, Justin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Jennifer T. Lee. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3831186 by Attorney Jennifer T. Lee on behalf of Plaintiff Eureka Database Solutions, LLC.(Lee, Jennifer)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Cabrach J. Connor. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3831050 by Attorney Cabrach J. Connor on behalf of Plaintiff Eureka Database Solutions, LLC.(Connor, Cabrach)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. Complaint filed on 12/20/2018. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JAB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Agile Sports Technologies, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JAB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Agile Sports Technologies, Inc. regarding Complaint,, #1 . (Eichmann, Justin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Monument Patent Holdings, LLC for Eureka Database Solutions, LLC. by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiffs Eureka Database Solutions, LLC, Monument Patent Holdings, LLC.(Eichmann, Justin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand and Place of Trial Designation against Agile Sports Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3827836), by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Eureka Database Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The 287 Patent, titled Technique for ranking multimedia annotations of interest, #2 Exhibit B - The 189 Patent, titled Technique for matching a query to a portion of media, #3 Exhibit C - The 708 Patent, titled Technique for accessing an item of interest within a stored representation of data)(Eichmann, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eureka Database Solutions, LLC v. Agile Sports Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agile Sports Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eureka Database Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Harvat
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: Jennifer T. Lee
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?