Fehderau v. Catholic Health Initiatives
Plaintiff: Ryan Elliot Fehderau
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives
Case Number: 8:2018cv00591
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #13 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (Regenerated to USCA - 8th Circuit) (LKO)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-1122) If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, pre-sentence report (3 copies), exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (LKO)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-1122) The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by February 14, 2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (LKO)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA Interlocutory Appeal #7 , Memorandum and Order #6 , and Memorandum and Order granting IFP #9 . Notice of Appeal filed on 1/10/19 by Plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (LKO)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #8 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (LKO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #6 filed by pro se plaintiff Ryan Fehderau. (LKO)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #2 ) is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Plaintiff's Motion for Exemption from Payment of the PACER User Fee (filing no. #5 ) is denied to the extent Plaintiff seeks a discretionary exemption above and beyond the automatic exemption he receives as a case participant. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Exemption from Payment of the PACER user fee on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (LKO)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (LKO)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catholic Health Initiatives filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Ryan Elliot Fehderau. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fehderau v. Catholic Health Initiatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Elliot Fehderau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?