Hays, et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al
Plaintiff: Polly A. Hays and James M. Hays
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, U.S. Bank National Association, Edward E. Brink, SouthLaw, PC and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00600
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due September 13, 2019. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate by Attorney Luke T. Deaver on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Hays.(Deaver, Luke)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: A Planning Conference set for Wednesday, February 13, 2019, at 3:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Parties shall call in using the case conference instructions filed separately in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Service for Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Luke T. Deaver on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Hays.(Deaver, Luke)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/8/2019. On or before January 29, 2019, a party shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference call if: a. One or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report; or b. The parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report; or c. The parties are currently and actively pursuing settlement and believe preparing and filing a Rule 26(f) Report may be unnecessary. Mandatory disclosures shall be served by February 8, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney P. Russell Perdew on behalf of Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association (Perdew, P.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association (Sawyer, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association (Sawyer, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney John A. Sauder has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant SouthLaw, PC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Attorney David J. Koukol on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Koukol, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Civil Cover Sheet by Attorney David J. Koukol on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Koukol, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against James M. Hays, Polly A. Hays from DISTRICT COURT OF BUFFALO COUNTY, NEBRASKA, Case number CI 18-680 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3832764) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney David J. Koukol on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2 to Notice of Removal)(Koukol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays, et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: David J. Koukol
Represented By: Michael W. Milone
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Represented By: P. Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: David J. Koukol
Represented By: Michael W. Milone
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Represented By: P. Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward E. Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SouthLaw, PC
Represented By: Liliana E. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: David J. Koukol
Represented By: Michael W. Milone
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Represented By: P. Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly A. Hays
Represented By: John A. Sauder
Represented By: Luke T. Deaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Hays
Represented By: John A. Sauder
Represented By: Luke T. Deaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?